skip to content

Fadeel, Khalid Saleh

CPSO#: 88136

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Mar 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malvern Medical Center
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

LAKERIDGE HEALTH
580 Hrwood south
Ajax ON  L1S2J4
Canada
Phone: 9056832320 Ext. 3247
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

SCARBOROUGH HEALTH NET WORK
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 4162817387
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Khalid Fadeel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fadeel ( CPSO# 88136 )

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Center
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (647) 226-1636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 Feb 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 03 Feb 2020 Active
             As from February 3, 2020, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Khalid Saleh Fadeel
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fadeel to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. KHALID SALEH FADEEL
                                          ("Dr. Fadeel")
                  
                                                 to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the
                  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Fadeel, certificate of registration number 88136, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that the College investigated a public
                  complaint bearing File Number 1106178 (the "Investigation") into my
                  emergency medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Fadeel, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fadeel, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in medical
                              record keeping; and

                        (ii)  review, reflection and written summary of emergency
                              department diagnosis and management of metabolic acidosis.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fadeel, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fadeel, undertake to complete this requirement within four
                        (4) months, if no satisfactory program is available by that time,
                        by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fadeel, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5)
                        above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the
                        Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor" or "Assessors"). I acknowledge that the
                        Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my
                        care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fadeel, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fadeel, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fadeel, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

                  (c)   I, Dr. Fadeel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into a complaint about
                              Dr. Fadeel's emergency medicine pratice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Fadeel will engage in professional education in
                                    medical records and emergency department diagnosis and
                                    management of metabolic acidosis.

                                    Dr. Fadeel's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fadeel, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Fadeel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Fadeel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Fadeel, give my irrevocable consent to all Assessors, to disclose
                  to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (d)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of the
                        Reassessment which they reasonably believe indicates a potential
                        risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 3, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Khalid Saleh Fadeel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 3, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into a complaint about Dr. Fadeel’s emergency medicine pratice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Fadeel will engage in professional education in medical records and emergency department diagnosis and management of metabolic acidosis

Dr. Fadeel’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 29, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)