skip to content

Fadaz, Annissa

CPSO#: 92214

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:UNIVERSITE DE LOME AU TOGO, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2405 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M5
Phone: 4167553131
Fax: 4167554131 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Annissa Fadaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fadaz ( CPSO# 92214 )

Business Address:
336 Donald Street
Ottawa ON  K1K 1M5
Phone Number: (613) 563-2121

Business Address:
2405 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M5
Phone Number: 4167553131


Corporation Name: Dr. Annissa Fadaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fadaz ( CPSO# 92214 )

Business Address:
2405 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M5
Phone Number: 4167553131

Business Address:
336 Donald Street
Ottawa ON  K1K 1M5
Phone Number: (613) 563-2121

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNISSA FADAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011