skip to content

Taucer, Fabiano Antonio Stefano

CPSO#: 31559

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4521 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd
Unit 1924
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre Orlean
Ottawa ON  K1C 6V8
Canada
Phone: 613 749 1242
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8098
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F.A.S. Taucer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Taucer ( CPSO# 31559 )

Business Address:
1924 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 6V8
Phone Number: (613) 513-5797

Business Address:
502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-1584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FABIANO ANTONIO STEFANO TAUCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAUCER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1980
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.