skip to content

Nazal, Faris Aziz

CPSO#: 78647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkway Forest Medical Center
Suite 40
105 Parkway Forest Drive
North York ON  M2J 1L8
Phone: (416) 502-3404
Fax: (416) 502-3017 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Faris Nazal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nazal ( CPSO# 78647 )

Business Address:
40 - 105 Parkway Forest Drive
North York ON  M2J 1L8
Phone Number: (416) 502-3404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARIS AZIZ NAZAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAZAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019