skip to content

Issa, Farrah

CPSO#: 103944

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 802
1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: 613-725-2335
Fax: 613-212-8755 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Farrah Issa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Issa ( CPSO# 103944)

Business Address:
802 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 725-2335

Business Address:
420 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2N6
Phone Number: (613) 233-4697

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 233-4697

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARRAH ISSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016