skip to content

Berger, Ferco Henricus

CPSO#: 110670

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 2016
EXPIRY DATE
28 Jul 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Jul 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Amsterdam, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Ave
Room AG-58C
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 83686
Fax: (416) 480-5855 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Dr. Ferco H. Berger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2023

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Ferco Henricus Berger may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Diagnostic Radiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Berger
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Berger  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Berger's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Berger's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 29, 2016. In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on July 28, 2023.