skip to content

Abdelsayed, Fady

CPSO#: 100533

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. B. Junqueira-Duarte ( CPSO# 93836 )
Dr. S. Zaheer ( CPSO# 95170 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111


Corporation Name: Fady Abdelsayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: FADY ABDELSAYED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
981 Avery Ave
Peterborough ON  K9J 0G9
Phone Number: 905-741-7922


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FADY ABDELSAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELSAYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014