skip to content

Eyjolfson, Ronald Clayton Eysteinn

CPSO#: 23580

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Icelandic

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 8, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 15, 2010, Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre notified the College that Dr. Ronald Clayton Eysteinn Eyjolfson's privileges were suspended from September 8, 2010 to September 29, 2010.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012