skip to content

Everett, Tobias Christopher

CPSO#: 93998

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tobias C. Everett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Everett ( CPSO# 93998 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesiology
555 Unversity Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:02 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Tobias Christopher Everett may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. Everett holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Everett no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.