Everdell, Kate Elizabeth (CPSO#: 101034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Toronto Rd.
Suite 203
Port Hope ON  L1A 3S4
Phone: 905-885-5511
Fax: 289-436-0120
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Everdell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Everdell ( CPSO# 101034)

Business Address:
Suite 204
249 Ontario Street
Port Hope ON  L1A 2V9
Phone Number: (905) 885-5511

Business Address:
390 King Street East
Cobourg ON  K9A 4K6
Phone Number: (905) 372-5451

Business Address:
99 Toronto Road
200 - 203
Port Hope ON  L1A 3S4
Phone Number: (905) 885-0611

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATE ELIZABETH EVERDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVERDELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015