skip to content

Evans-Olders, Rebecca

CPSO#: 93739

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Nepean Community
Health Centre
Suite 201
4100 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON  K2J 0V2
Phone: (613) 288-2820
Fax: (613) 288-3690 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA EVANS-OLDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS-OLDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012