skip to content

Evans, Michael David

CPSO#: 90062

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
325 Pleasant Street
Halifax NS  B2Y 4G8
Phone: (902) 465-8300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia
Nova Scotia
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:17 Nov 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2008