skip to content

Euverman, Rachel Marie

CPSO#: 90781

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Patient Networks
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone: (416) 362-8822
Fax: (416) 362-8877 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: McVey Euverman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Euverman ( CPSO# 90781 )
Dr. M. McVey ( CPSO# 90842 )

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Business Address:
Patient Networks
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHEL MARIE EUVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EUVERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011