skip to content

Etoom, Yousef Ahmad Tawfiq

CPSO#: 85032

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
12th Floor
525 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7424 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St.Joseph health center
30 The Queensway
Paediatric Department
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3630
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Etoom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Etoom ( CPSO# 85032 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2020 Active
 1.    Dr. Yousef Ahmad Tawfiq Etoom may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Emergency Medicine, University of Toronto,
                        in  which  Dr.  Etoom  holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration  will  expire  on  the  earlier  of  the
                  following times:

                  (i)   on June 30, 2021, or
                  
                  (ii)  when Dr. Etoom no longer holds the academic appointment at the rank
                        of  Assistant  Professor in the Department of Paediatrics, Division
                        of Emergency Medicine, University of Toronto, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee  makes  a decision about Dr. Etoom's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report.
                  
            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Etoom's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content.
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  1,  2013.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2021.


Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 11, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)