skip to content

Ethier, Josee-Lyne Renee Gisele

CPSO#: 92773

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6694 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Josee-Lyne Ethier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ethier ( CPSO# 92773 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEE-LYNE RENEE GISELE ETHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014