skip to content

Etemadi, Behzad Ali Sanii

CPSO#: 85142

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lawrence Park Cardiology
Suite #4076
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: 6473476644
Fax: 6473476647 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alliston Diagnostic Centre
Unit 21
117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Canada
Phone: (705) 434-0074
Fax: (705) 434-9074
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Unit 501
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T4S5
Canada
Phone: 9054978177
Fax: 9054978277
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Behzad Etemadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Etemadi ( CPSO# 85142 )

Business Address:
21-23 - 117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (888) 662-0680

Business Address:
4076 - 3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (647) 347-6644

Business Address:
103 - 1615 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Phone Number: (416) 654-6019

Business Address:
501 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 497-8177

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BEHZAD ALI SANII ETEMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETEMADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013