skip to content

Essue, Jason James

CPSO#: 96231

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Abelard Ave
Brampton ON  L6Y 2K7
Phone: 226-678-8910 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Essue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Essue ( CPSO# 96231 )

Business Address:
9 Abelard Avenue
Brampton ON  L6Y 2K7
Phone Number: (226) 678-8910

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASON JAMES ESSUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESSUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013