skip to content

Esmond, Elizabeth Mary

CPSO#: 32373

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 May 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 May 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1R9
Phone: (613) 739-8388
Fax: (613) 731-2248 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. E.M. Esmond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MARY ESMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESMOND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1981