skip to content

Esadeg, Souad Mohamed

CPSO#: 87638

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westmount Place Walk-In Clinic
50 Wesrmount Place N
Waterloo ON  N2L 2R5
Phone: (519) 954-0111
Fax: (519) 954-0112 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

K-W Walk-In Clinic
100 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B4
Canada
Phone: (519) 279-4098
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Laurier Student Wellness Centre
Waterloo Campus
75 University Ave
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Canada
Phone: 519-884-0710 Ext. 3146
Fax: 519-885-4865
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOUAD MOHAMED ESADEG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESADEG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009