skip to content

Erragamreddy, Sai Kalyan Reddy

CPSO#: 96889

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: 905-239-4664 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

385 Fairwar Rd S
Kitchener ON  N2C 2N9
Canada
Phone: 519-748-2327
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

751 Victoria St S
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Canada
Phone: 519-745-2273
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sai Kalyan Reddy Erragamreddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Erragamreddy ( CPSO# 96889 )

Business Address:
300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1

Business Address:
56 Grand Avenue North
Cambridge ON  N1S 2K9
Phone Number: (519) 622-1577

Medical Records Location

Instructions: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Telephone: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 28 Apr 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAI KALYAN REDDY ERRAGAMREDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERRAGAMREDDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015