skip to content

Ernjakovic, Milan

CPSO#: 89437

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Novi Sad, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105-170 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: 289/554-9585
Fax: 905/232-1889 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

330 York Regional Rd 7
Unit # 510
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: 905-707-5008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1366 Yonge St
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-0262
Fax: 416-926-0936
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Milan Ernjakovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2017
Corporation Name: Milan Ernjakovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ernjakovic ( CPSO# 89437 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
170 Queensway W
Suite 105
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (289) 554 9585

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MILAN ERNJAKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNJAKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2015