skip to content

Hentschel, Eric Philip

CPSO#: 52851

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-50 Westmount Rd N
Waterloo ON  N2L 2R5
Phone: 5195700062
Fax: 5195709551 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Region Of Waterloo Public Health
99 regina st. S
Waterloo ON  N2J 4V3
Canada
Phone: (519) 575-4400
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Grand River Hospital
835 King St. W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3611
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eric Hentschel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hentschel ( CPSO# 52851 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G8

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Business Address:
306 - 18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 570-0062

Business Address:
GRH Freeport Site
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC PHILIP HENTSCHEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENTSCHEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1987