skip to content

Ergun, Suzan Selin

CPSO#: 95579

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Suzan Ergun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ergun ( CPSO# 95579 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:05 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUZAN SELIN ERGUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERGUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 08 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 08 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2018