skip to content

Erez, Hanna Jafa

CPSO#: 27966

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hanna Erez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Management Ltd. 13 - 1 High Meadow Pl Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 12 Mar 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2019