skip to content

Epstein, Norman

CPSO#: 16514

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Dec 1957

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 15-Dec-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place
Unit 13
North York, ON  M9L 0A3

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 02 Nov 2020


Instructions/Address:

Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13
Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3
Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 647 933 2904
Date Received: 27 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014