skip to content

Enzevaei, Atoosa

CPSO#: 95635

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905)895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

10350 Yonge St
Suite 002
Noble Medical and Diagnostics
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-5433
Fax: 905-747-1511
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

77 Queensway West
Suit 207/209
Advanced Cardio Diagnostics
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Canada
Phone: 647-351-6647
Fax: 647-351-6648
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

11 Lakeside Terrace
Unt 302
Pace Cardiology
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Canada
Phone: 705-721-4422
Fax: 705-721-5577
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Enzevaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Enzevaei ( CPSO# 95635 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:26 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ATOOSA ENZEVAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENZEVAEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2014