skip to content

Ens, Andrea Rae Doris

CPSO#: 90009

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858138 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Ave, Windsor, ON
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Brokenshire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA RAE DORIS ENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2009 to 20 Nov 2009
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2010 to 12 Mar 2010
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Jan 2016
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2015