Enriquez, Karen De Manuel (CPSO#: 100407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
461 Holland St W
Bradford ON  L3Z 0C1
Phone: 905-775-5327
Fax: 905-775-0693
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pickering College
Student Health Centre
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4X2
Canada
Phone: 905-895-1700
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Residential Care Village
640 Grace St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8V7
Canada
Phone: 9058957661
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. De Manuel Enriquez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Enriquez ( CPSO# 100407)

Business Address:
640 Grace Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 895-7661

Business Address:
16945 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4X2
Phone Number: (905) 895-1700

Business Address:
461 Holland Street West
Bradford ON  L3Z 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 775-5327

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN DE MANUEL ENRIQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENRIQUEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015