skip to content

Ennis, Jesse David

CPSO#: 88497

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013