Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: June 02, 2022
Summary:
Effective June 2, 2022, the New York State Administrative Review Board for Professional Medical Conduct made an Order finding that Dr. Enker had committed professional misconduct but declined to impose a penalty. This Order confirmed the determination by the New York Board of Professional Misconduct (BPMC) on December 8, 2021. The professional misconduct in question related to violations by Dr. Enker of the New York Public Health Laws for (a) failing to safeguard his Prescription Monitoring Program username and password, which resulted in unauthorized access to the Prescription Monitoring Program in 2015, and (b) by failing to consult the Prescription Monitoring Program prior to writing certain prescriptions for controlled substances in 2018. On November 11, 2019, Dr. Enker had entered into a Stipulation and Order with the New York Department of Health to settle an administrative enforcement action in which Dr. Enker admitted to violating the New York Public Health Laws and agreed to pay a civil monetary penalty of $4000.
The College was notified of this finding by a report from FSMB dated June 8, 2022.