skip to content

Eneh, Amaka Ann

CPSO#: 95153

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 203 1342 Hillside Avenue Victoria, BC V8T 2C1
Date Received: 09 Jun 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020