skip to content

Emsalem, Ahmed Mohamed Khir M

CPSO#: 85476

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117-625 Parsons Rd SW
Edmonton AB  T6X 0N9
Phone: 7804693434
Fax: 7804695979

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Neurology Effective:01 Jan 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMED MOHAMED KHIR M EMSALEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMSALEM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021