skip to content

Emsalem, Abdurahman Mohamed

CPSO#: 97448

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

194 Talbot St W
Erie Shore Health care
Internal Medicine department
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: 5192362373 Ext. 4144
Fax: 5193223829
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Emsalem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Emsalem ( CPSO# 97448 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Sciences
Department of Internal Medicine
1800 8th Street East
P.O. Box 1800
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Libya

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:19 Apr 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Sep 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2013 Active
             Dr.  Abdurahman Mohamed Emsalem may practise medicine independently in internal
            medicine, only.