Emond, Michael Gerard Joseph (CPSO#: 30829)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J Emond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Emond ( CPSO# 30829 )

Business Address:
934 Park Place
Kincardine ON  N2Z 0B9

Medical Records Location

Address: Kincardine Family Health Team, 44 Queen Street, Kincardine, Ontario N2Z 3C2 Tel: (519) 396-2700
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Dec 2018