skip to content

Emini, Neim Nick

CPSO#: 92181

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterloo walk-in clinic
170 University Ave. West
Unit 13
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Phone: 519-725-1514
Fax: 519-725-5137 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2N 0B1
Canada
Phone: (519) 279-4098
Fax: (519) 279-4099
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

100 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nick Emini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Emini ( CPSO# 92181 )

Business Address:
Waterloo Walk-In Clinic
13-170 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Phone Number: (519) 725-1514

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEIM NICK EMINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2011