skip to content

Guirguis, Emad Mikhail

CPSO#: 55334

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Emad Guirguis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, Ontario, M3J 1Y6. Phone: 1-888-563-3732. Website: www.rsrs.com.
Date Received: 01 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:12 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 May 2020
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Nov 2020
Summary:

On January 10, 2020, allegations of Dr. Guirguis’s professional misconduct were referred to the 
 Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Guirguis engaged in disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by performing surgical cosmetic procedures that were outside 
 of his scope of practice, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct through 
 his online advertising and in his communications with Patient A.  

 The matter was heard on November 23, 2020, by way of videoconference, in the presence of Dr. 
 Guirguis, counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Guirguis. On the basis of a Statement of 
 Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest (Liability), the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Guirguis 
 committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has contravened the Act, the Regulated Health 
 Professions Act, 1991 or the regulations under either of those Acts; and has engaged in an act or 
 omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would be 
 reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  

 Disposition  

 Noting that Dr. Guirguis undertook to resign from the College and never to apply or re-apply to practise 
medicine in any jurisdiction, the Discipline Committee issued its Order dated November 24, 2020, 
directing that:  

- Dr. Guirguis appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and  

- Dr. Guirguis pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the date of this Order.  

On March 9, 2021, the Committee released its full reasons for decision, including the Statement of 
Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest. The decision is available for review on the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 23, 2020

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: November 23, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Emad Mikhail Guirguis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 23, 2020:

Dr. Guirguis was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations that he has contravened the Medicine Act, 1991, the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 or the regulations under either of those Acts; and that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. College investigations were also conducted into whether Dr. Guirguis engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general surgery/cosmetic surgery practice. Dr. Guirguis’s certificate of registration expired on September 4, 2020. In the face of these allegations and these investigations, Dr. Guirguis has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 17, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)