skip to content

Elzayat, Ehab Abdalla

CPSO#: 97630

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Azhar University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Medical Group
4289 Innes Road
Orléans ON  K1E 0A8
Phone: (613)686-1911
Fax: (613) 830-1901 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1935 Bank St,
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Canada
Phone: 613-5212391
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EHAB ABDALLA ELZAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELZAYAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Urology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017