skip to content

Elyas, Tereza

CPSO#: 93941

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primacy Dufferin Family Care Centre
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York ON  M3J 3N4
Phone: (416)739-1562
Fax: (416)739-6671 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6265 Ext. 1
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite #152
1880 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1L2L1
Canada
Phone: 416-285-7575
Fax: 416-285-7574
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T. Elyas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Elyas ( CPSO# 93941 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6265

Business Address:
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York ON  M3J 3N4
Phone Number: (416) 285-7575

Business Address:
152-1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (647) 347-0576

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TEREZA ELYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELYAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2012