skip to content

Elsohemy, Amal Salah

CPSO#: 95980

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kaiser Permanente
1000 Franklin Pkwy
San Mateo, California
94403
San Mateo CA  94403
United States
Phone: (650) 358-7015

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amal Elsohemy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elsohemy ( CPSO# 95980 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMAL SALAH ELSOHEMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSOHEMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013