skip to content

Elrify, Elsaid Ragab Mahmoud

CPSO#: 89643

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ajax & Pickering hospital
Department of Paediatrics
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 4680 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elrify Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elrify ( CPSO# 89643 )

Business Address:
RVHS Rouge Valley Ajax & Pickering
Department of Paediatrics
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4


Corporation Name: Elrify Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elrify ( CPSO# 89643 )

Business Address:
RVHS Rouge Valley Ajax & Pickering
Department of Paediatrics
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:17 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016 Active
             Dr.  Elsaid  Ragab  Mahmoud  Elrify  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            paediatrics and neonatology.