Ellsworth, Julie Caroline (CPSO#: 100635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 South Front Street
Suite 200
Belleville ON  K8N 2Y3
Phone: (613) 779-9910
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Ellsworth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ellsworth ( CPSO# 100635)

Business Address:
Suite 200
10 South Front Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2Y3
Phone Number: (613) 779-9910

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE CAROLINE ELLSWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLSWORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2018