skip to content

Ellison, Philip Angus

CPSO#: 31479

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing, 2nd Floor
2W404
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888 Ext. 4
Fax: (416) 603-5448 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Philip Ellison and Patricia-Lynn Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ellison ( CPSO# 31479 )
Dr. P. Hughes ( CPSO# 31540 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Western Family Health Team WW 2nd Floor 399 Bathurst St, Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Date Received: 06 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019