skip to content

Ellies, Vanessa Anne

CPSO#: 100803

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Ophthalmology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lougheed and Ellies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lougheed ( CPSO# 97609 )
Dr. V. Ellies ( CPSO# 100803)

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department of Ophthalmology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANESSA ANNE ELLIES shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ELLIES is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ELLIES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ELLIES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ELLIES shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ELLIES is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ELLIES no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 19 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2018 to 19 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019