skip to content

Elkurbo, Mohamed Abdussalam

CPSO#: 98988

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B
503 Pitt Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 3R4
Phone: (613) 930-2662
Fax: (613) 930-2600 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elkurbo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Elkurbo ( CPSO# 98988 )

Business Address:
Unit B
503 Pitt Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 3R4
Phone Number: (613) 930-2662

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ABDUSSALAM ELKURBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELKURBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012