skip to content

Elkin, Eric Neil

CPSO#: 24287

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Nov 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Elkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Amica Retirement Residence Westboro 491 Richmond Road Ottawa, ON K2A 1G4 Or Carling Retirement Community 200 Lockhart Avenue Ottawa, ON K2A 4C6
Instructions: Non-Office Records: Royal Ottawa Place LTC 1141 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Z 7K4
Date Received: 11 May 2020


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 1-800-775-0093 www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 09 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020