skip to content

Elkheir, Shiraz Yahia Mohamed

CPSO#: 98789

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
La Verendrye Hospital
Riverside Healthcare
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone: (807) 274-3261 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

301 Victoria Ave
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Canada
Phone: 18072743287 Ext. 249
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jenks ( CPSO# 55667 )
Dr. J. Burley ( CPSO# 109503)
Dr. L. Keffer ( CPSO# 111231)
Dr. S. Elkheir ( CPSO# 98789 )
Dr. M. Ruppenstein ( CPSO# 98445 )
Dr. K. Eltawil ( CPSO# 97650 )
Dr. M. Kowal ( CPSO# 100791)
Dr. J. Nelson ( CPSO# 55513 )
Dr. R. Nugent ( CPSO# 66632 )
Dr. V. Patel ( CPSO# 108275)
Dr. C. Botsford ( CPSO# 109944)
Dr. M. Halvorsen ( CPSO# 100103)

Business Address:
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-3287

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Business Address:
1460 Idylwild Drive
RMB 2004 RR#2
Fort Frances ON  P9A 3M3

Business Address:
310 Nelson Street
Fort Frances ON  P9A 1B1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7708


Corporation Name: Shiraz Elkheir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elkheir ( CPSO# 98789 )

Business Address:
La Verendrye Hospital
Riverside Healthcare
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3266

Business Address:
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-3287

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIRAZ YAHIA MOHAMED ELKHEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELKHEIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016