skip to content

Elkadri, Abdul Aziz

CPSO#: 93791

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of Beirut, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2016