skip to content

Safar Zadeh, Elika

CPSO#: 99648

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108 A
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (647) 350-3332
Fax: (647) 350-3334 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie St.
Department Of Medicine
North York General Hospital.
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 4157566002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Safar Zadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:22 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:22 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Elika Safar Zadeh’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Safar Zadeh engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by inappropriately, and without consent, accessing the medical records of a patient, and inappropriately, and without consent, disclosing and/or threatening to disclose the personal health information of the patient.  It is also alleged that Dr. Safar Zadeh engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of her treatment of another patient, including in her prescribing and/or providing medical treatment to a family member/person close to her.


 

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Merits; 2023-02-28

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014 Active
             Dr.  Elika Safar Zadeh may practise medicine independently in internal medicine
            and endocrinology, only. 


Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 15, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)