skip to content

Elias, Maya Stefanie

CPSO#: 100720

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Family Medicine Centre
104-2555 St Joseph Blvd
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAYA STEFANIE ELIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015