skip to content

Elias, Cynthia Gayle

CPSO#: 31642

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1985